US HB353 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-29 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Access to Hearing Health Act of 2015 Authorizes the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to appoint licensed hearing aid specialists in the Veterans Health Administration. Requires the Secretary to submit an annual report on: (1) the timely access of veterans to VA hearing health services, and (2) VA contracting policies regarding the provision of hearing health services to veterans in non-VA facilities.
Title
Veterans' Access to Hearing Health Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] |
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] | Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2016-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB564 (Related) 2015-09-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/353/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr353/BILLS-114hr353ih.pdf |