US HB3520 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To improve the provision of care and services under the Veterans Community Care Program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Care Improvement Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Jennifer Kiggans [R-VA] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] | Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] |
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Morgan Luttrell [R-TX] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Nicole Malliotakis [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Carlos Gimenez [R-FL] |
Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] | Rep. Brad Finstad [R-MN] | Rep. Anna Luna [R-FL] |
Rep. Scott Fitzgerald [R-WI] | Rep. Mike Flood [R-NE] | Rep. Michelle Steel [R-CA] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Cory Mills [R-FL] | Rep. Keith Self [R-TX] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Rudolph Yakym III [R-IN] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] |
Rep. Andrew Ogles [R-TN] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Monica De La Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-18 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-06-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-06-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-05-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-05-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/3520/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr3520/BILLS-118hr3520ih.pdf |