US HB3506 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospice Evaluation and Legitimate Payment Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act with respect to the face-to-face encounter framework in hospice care. Allows a clinical nurse specialist, physician assistant, or other health professional (in addition to a hospice physician or a nurse practitioner, as under current law) to conduct the face-to-face encounter with an individual to determine continued eligibility for hospice care before the first 60-day (currently, 180-day) recertification period and each subsequent recertification period. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish a Medicare Hospice Payment Reform demonstration program to test any revisions to the methodology for determining payment rates for routine home care and other hospice care services. Sets at every three years the frequency of surveys of certified hospice program entities.
Title
Hospice Evaluation and Legitimate Payment Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-11-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-11-22 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-11-22 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-11-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB722 (Same As) 2011-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2089-2090)
Subjects
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/3506/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr3506/BILLS-112hr3506ih.pdf |