US HB3465 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Fallen Journalists Memorial Act This bill authorizes the Fallen Journalists Memorial Foundation to establish a commemorative work on federal land in commemoration of America's commitment to a free press as represented by journalists who sacrificed their lives in their line of work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fallen Journalists Memorial Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2020-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4559-4560)
2020-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3465.
2020-09-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4559-4560)
2020-09-21HouseMs. Haaland moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-08-04HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 373.
2020-08-04HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-466.
2020-01-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2020-01-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-12-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-07-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-06-25HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-06-25HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1969 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback