US HB3448 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-21)
Status: Engrossed on November 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend chapter 3081 of title 54, United States Code, to enhance the protection and preservation of America's battlefields.
Title
American Battlefield Protection Program Enhancement Act of 2023
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2023-11-06 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-11-06 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5412-5413) |
2023-11-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3448. |
2023-11-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5412-5414) |
2023-11-06 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-11-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 215. |
2023-11-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-266. |
2023-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2023-07-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3568 (Related) 2024-05-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
HB6492 (Related) 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate.
HB6492 (Related) 2024-04-10 - Received in the Senate.