US HB3433 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to specify the criteria used to exclude certain procedures from the list of covered surgical procedures that may be performed in an ambulatory surgical center under Medicare. The bill also requires the expert outside advisory panel that reviews the Medicare prospective payment system for hospital outpatient department services to include at least one ambulatory surgical center representative.
Title
ASC Payment Transparency Act of 2019 Ambulatory Surgical Center Payment Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3416 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
SB3085 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
SB3085 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Health
Health care coverage and access
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
Health
Health care coverage and access
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Surgery and anesthesia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3433/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3433/BILLS-116hr3433ih.pdf |