US HB3428 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes federal agencies to double the value of contracts awarded to small businesses in the U.S. Virgin Islands, American Samoa, Guam, or the Northern Mariana Islands for the purpose of obtaining credit towards the small business contracting goal.
Title
Contracting Credit Equality Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
American Samoa
Commerce
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
Commerce
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3428/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3428/BILLS-116hr3428ih.pdf |