US HB3417 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-24 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends funding for, and makes a series of changes to, Medicare enrollment, payment, and prescription drug programs. Among other things, the bill extends funding through FY2022 for state health insurance programs, area agencies on aging, aging and disability resource centers, technical assistance related to outreach and enrollment, and certain quality-measurement activities; requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services to establish a transition program under the Medicare prescription drug benefit for limited-income, newly eligible individuals (i.e., individuals who are eligible for subsidies and have not yet enrolled in, or whose coverage has not yet taken effect under, a Medicare or Medicare Advantage prescription drug plan); revises payment rules for graduate medical education costs with respect to a hospital that establishes a new medical residency training program; and authorizes additional quality measures for the skilled nursing facility (SNF) value-based purchasing program, which provides incentive payments to SNFs based on their quality of care.
Title
BETTER Act of 2019 Beneficiary Education Tools, Telehealth, and Extenders Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 574. |
2020-12-24 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2020-12-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-691, Part I. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by the Yeas and Nays: 41 - 0. |
2019-06-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3029 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3406 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3421 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3425 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3039 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB3406 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3408 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3415 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3421 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3425 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3430 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Aging
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability assistance
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Nursing
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Aging
Congressional oversight
Department of Health and Human Services
Disability assistance
Education programs funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medical education
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Nursing
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Public-private cooperation
State and local finance
State and local government operations
User charges and fees