US HB3406 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
If You Like Your Health Plan, You Can Keep it Act - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) to prohibit anything in the Act from being construed to require an individual to terminate coverage under a group health plan or health insurance coverage in which the individual was enrolled during any part of the period beginning on the date of enactment of PPACA (March 23, 2010) and ending on December 31, 2013. Allows: (1) continuation of coverage under a group health plan or health insurance in which an individual was enrolled during any part of such period, regardless of whether the individual renews such coverage; (2) family members of the individual to join coverage under such a plan that is renewed; (3) new employees to join a group health plan that provides coverage during any part of such period; and (4) continuation of coverage maintained pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement that was ratified before the end of such period.
Title
If You Like Your Health Plan, You Can Keep it Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-10-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1617 (Same As) 2013-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Employee benefits and pensions
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3406/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3406/BILLS-113hr3406ih.pdf |