US HB3396 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-12-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the standardization of reciprocal fire suppression cost share agreements, and for other purposes.
Title
Fire Department Repayment Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Sen. John Curtis [R-UT] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Lori Chavez-DeRemer [R-OR] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Kevin Kiley [R-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D-CA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Celeste Maloy [R-UT] | Rep. Chuck Edwards [R-NC] | Rep. Greg Landsman [D-OH] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Anthony D'Esposito [R-NY] |
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] | Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
Rep. Emilia Sykes [D-OH] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Kevin Mullin [D-CA] | Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-12-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-12-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7288-7289) |
2024-12-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3396. |
2024-12-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7288-7290) |
2024-12-17 | House | Mr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-11-18 | House | House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024. |
2024-11-18 | House | House Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024. |
2024-11-18 | House | House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 19, 2024. |
2024-11-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-750, Part I. |
2023-12-06 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-12-06 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2023-06-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Forestry. |
2023-05-23 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2023-05-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Armed Services, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2520 (Related) 2023-07-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.