US HB339 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-53. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 115-53. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Northern Mariana Islands Economic Expansion Act (Sec. 2) This bill revises Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands (CNMI) transitional worker (CW-1 visa) provisions. The supplemental vocational education fee charged to a prospective CNMI employer for each transitional worker is increased from $150 to $200. Construction occupation permits may be issued only to extend permits issued before October 1, 2015, except that for FY2017, an additional 350 permits shall be made available with at least 60 reserved for health care practitioners and technical operations and at least 10 reserved for plant and system operators.
Title
Northern Mariana Islands Economic Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-53. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-08-11 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H6601; text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H6601) |
2017-08-11 | Senate | Mrs. Comstock asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.744 Amendment SA 744 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.744 Amendment SA 744 proposed by Senator Portman for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S4686; text: CR S4686) To permit the extension of 350 nonimmigrant permits for workers in the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands. |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4686-4687) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-01-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-01-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H710) |
2017-01-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 339. |
2017-01-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H710-712) |
2017-01-30 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Building construction
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
Northern Mariana Islands
User charges and fees
Foreign labor
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
Northern Mariana Islands
User charges and fees