US HB3386 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
21st Century Energy Workforce Act This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a National Center of Excellence for the 21st Century Workforce Advisory Board to: (1) support and develop training and science education programs, (2) align apprenticeship programs and industry certifications to further develop succession planning in the energy sector, (3) integrate educational standards to develop foundational skills for elementary and secondary education and postsecondary education to create a pipeline between education and career, and (4) support the replication of existing model energy curricula. DOE shall also establish a pilot program to award grants on a competitive basis to eligible entities for job training to obtain an industry-recognized credential. Grant amounts are limited to $1 million for any one year. The federal share of the cost of a job training and education program using a grant shall be up to 65%, while the non-federal share may not be less than 50% cash.
Title
21st Century Energy Workforce Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1304 (Same As) 2015-05-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
SB2089 (Related) 2015-09-29 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 241.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Alternative and renewable resources
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Oil and gas
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Alternative and renewable resources
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Oil and gas
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3386/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3386/BILLS-114hr3386ih.pdf |