US HB338 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stop Tobacco Smuggling in the Territories Act of 2013 - Amends the federal criminal code to include American Samoa, the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands, and Guam in the definition of "state" for purposes of provisions prohibiting trafficking in contraband cigarettes and smokeless tobacco.
Title
Stop Tobacco Smuggling in the Territories Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-05 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 421 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2013-03-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-03-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 421 - 5 (Roll no. 58). (text: CR H965) |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H967-968) |
2013-03-05 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-03-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 338. |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H965-966) |
2013-03-05 | House | Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
American Samoa
Crime and law enforcement
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. territories and protectorates
Crime and law enforcement
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Smuggling and trafficking
U.S. territories and protectorates