US HB3378 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-21 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 Elm Avenue in Munising, Michigan, as the "Elizabeth L. Kinnunen Post Office Building."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 220 Elm Avenue in Munising, Michigan, as the "Elizabeth L. Kinnunen Post Office Building".
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Dave Camp [R-MI] | Rep. Hansen Clarke [D-MI] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. John Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI] |
Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] | Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Rep. Mike J. Rogers [R-MI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2012-12-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-20 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/19/2012 H7334) |
2012-12-20 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7416) |
2012-12-19 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mrs. Maloney objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3378. |
2012-12-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7334-7335) |
2012-12-19 | House | Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2012-02-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-02-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Michigan
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Michigan
Postal service