US HB3372 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-29 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-29 - Referred to House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pay Our Bills Act - Authorizes an extension of the presidential authority to modify the public debt ceiling (subject to enactment of a congressional joint resolution of disapproval). Authorizes the Secretary of the Treasury to borrow an additional amount required to meet existing commitments if the President certifies to Congress that the public debt is within $100 billion of the current limit and that further borrowing is required. (The debt limit was $16.699 trillion before its suspension in the Continuing Appropriations Act, FY2014 [P.L. 113-46].) Authorizes Congress to use current requirements for expedited consideration of the joint resolution. Increases the debt limit by the certified amount if the time for disaproval has lapsed without enactment of the joint resolution. Suspends the debt limit for the period beginning on the date on which the President submits such a certification to Congress and ending on the earlier of: 15 calendar days after Congress receives the certification, or enactment of a joint resolution disapproving the President's exercise of authority for the debt limit under that certification. Increases the debt limit, effective on the day after the certification is submitted, to the extent that: the face amount of public debt obligations and those whose principal and interest are guaranteed by the U.S. government (except guaranteed obligations held by the Secretary) outstanding on the day after such date exceeds the face amount of such obligations outstanding on the date the President certifies Congress. Excludes from such formula any obligation whose issuance was not necessary to fund a commitment that required payment before the day after the certification is submitted to Congress. Prohibits the debt limit from being increased if a joint resolution of disapproval is enacted within 15 days after receipt by Congress (in session or not) of a presidential certification that the public debt is within $100 billion of the current limit. Provides for expedited consideration of such a joint resolution in the House and Senate.
Title
Pay Our Bills Act
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] |
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to House Rules |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-10-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Related) 2013-01-14 - Referred to House Rules
HB2775 (Related) 2013-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 113-46.
SB57 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1598 (Same As) 2013-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2775 (Related) 2013-10-17 - Became Public Law No: 113-46.
SB57 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1598 (Same As) 2013-10-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers
Congressional oversight
Economics and public finance
Legislative rules and procedure
Presidents and presidential powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/3372/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr3372/BILLS-113hr3372ih.pdf |