US HB337 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of the Interior, if Turnabout Ranch of Escalante, Utah, submits an offer to the Secretary to acquire specified federal land for the appraised value, to convey to the Ranch all right, title, and interest to such land. Requires Turnabout Ranch to pay: (1) to the Secretary an amount equal to the appraised value of the federal land; and (2) any costs of the conveyance of such land. Modifies the boundaries of the Grand Staircase-Escalante National Monument in Utah to exclude the federal land conveyed to Turnabout Ranch when the conveyance is completed.
Title
To provide for the sale of approximately 25 acres of public land to the Turnabout Ranch, Escalante, Utah, at fair market value.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Matheson [D-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-01-08 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2009-01-08 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E46) |
Same As/Similar To
HB146 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Became Public Law No: 111-11.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB219 (Related) 2009-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB22 (Related) 2009-03-11 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 282 - 144 (Roll no. 117).
SB219 (Related) 2009-01-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Utah
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/337/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr337/BILLS-111hr337ih.pdf |