US HB3369 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-10-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Assistant Secretary of Commerce for Communications and Information to conduct a study and hold public meetings with respect to artificial intelligence systems, and for other purposes.
Title
AI Accountability Act Artificial Intelligence Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Jay Obernolte [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195. |
2023-10-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-244. |
2023-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-07-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2023-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |