US HB3353 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to treat American Samoa and the Commonwealth of the Northern Mariana Islands as separate states for purposes of the Edward Byrne Memorial Justice Assistance Grant Program.
Title
To provide for American Samoa and the Commonwealth of the Northern Marianas to be treated as States for certain criminal justice programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Abercrombie [D-HI] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Donna Christensen [D-VI] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] |
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Laura Richardson [D-CA] | Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-09 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. | |
2010-12-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-12-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 12/7/2010 CR H8064) | |
2010-12-08 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8243) | |
2010-12-07 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Scott (VA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-12-07 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3353. | |
2010-12-07 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8064-8065) | |
2010-12-07 | Mr. Scott (VA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-08-19 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. | |
2009-07-27 | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
American Samoa
Crime and law enforcement
Law enforcement administration and funding
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates
Crime and law enforcement
Law enforcement administration and funding
Northern Mariana Islands
U.S. territories and protectorates