US HB3341 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize funds for Federal-aid highways, highway safety programs, and transit programs, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STARTER Act 2.0 Surface Transportation Advanced through Reform, Technology, and Efficient Review Act 2.0

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2021-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
2021-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
2021-05-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-19HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-19HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3042 (Related) 2021-05-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1089 (Related) 2021-02-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1745 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB1812 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB2187 (Related) 2021-03-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2306 (Related) 2021-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB2334 (Related) 2021-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB3777 (Related) 2021-06-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB659 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1710 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2062 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects

Accidents
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Africa
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Air quality
Algeria
Argentina
Asia
Atmospheric science and weather
Barbados
Bolivia
Brazil
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Building construction
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Caribbean area
Chile
China
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Colombia
Commuting
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Disability assistance
Dominican Republic
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Ecology
Economic development
Ecuador
Egypt
Emergency communications systems
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Emergency planning and evacuation
Employment and training programs
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental regulatory procedures
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Fires
Floods and storm protection
Foreign and international corporations
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Guatemala
Income tax exclusion
India
Indian lands and resources rights
Indonesia
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Kuwait
Labor standards
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Latin America
Lebanon
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
Manufacturing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Mexico
Middle East
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor carriers
Motor vehicles
Natural disasters
Pakistan
Paraguay
Performance measurement
Peru
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Railroads
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Roads and highways
Romania
Rural conditions and development
Russia
Sales and excise taxes
Saudi Arabia
Securities
Small business
Social security and elderly assistance
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Thailand
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Trinidad and Tobago
Turkey
Turkmenistan
Ukraine
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Uzbekistan
Venezuela
Vietnam
Wages and earnings
Water quality
Watersheds

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback