US HB334 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of State shall provide assistance: (1) to address the health care needs of covered individuals, (2) to institutions in Vietnam that provide health care to such individuals, (3) to repair and rebuild substandard homes in Vietnam for covered individuals and their families, and (4) to remediate geographic areas of Vietnam that contain high levels of Agent Orange. A "covered individual" is defined as an individual who is a Vietnam resident and who: (1) is affected by health issues related to Agent Orange exposure which took place between January 1, 1961, and May 7, 1975; (2) lives or had lived in or near geographic areas in Vietnam that continue to contain high levels of Agent Orange; or (3) is the child or descendant of such an individual and is affected by such health issues. State and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) shall provide assistance to support research relating to health issues of individuals affected by Agent Orange. The Department of Health and Human Services shall: (1) make grants to appropriate public health organizations and Vietnamese-American organizations to conduct a broad health assessment of Vietnamese-Americans who may have been exposed to Agent Orange and their children or descendants; and (2) establish centers in U.S. locations where large populations of Vietnamese-Americans reside to provide assessment, counseling, and treatment for conditions related to Agent Orange exposure. The bill amends veterans benefits provisions to provide benefits to the children of male (currently only female) Vietnam veterans who are affected by certain birth defects. The VA shall require any health care provider with whom the VA enters into a contract for the provision of health care to such children to provide the VA access to the medical records of such children for research into the intergenerational effects of Agent Orange exposure.
Title
Victims of Agent Orange Relief Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] |
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Asia
Birth defects
Conflicts and wars
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
World health
Birth defects
Conflicts and wars
Environmental health
Foreign aid and international relief
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
International affairs
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Veterans' medical care
Vietnam
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/334/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr334/BILLS-115hr334ih.pdf |