US HB3338 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-30)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Justice for Former American Hostages in Iran Act of 2015 Establishes in the Treasury the American Hostages in Iran Compensation Fund to: (1) make payments to the Americans held hostage in Iran, and to their families, who are identified as members of the proposed class in case number 1:00-CV-03110 (ESG) of the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia; and (2) satisfy their claims against Iran relating to the taking of hostages and treatment of personnel of the U.S. embassy in Tehran between November 4, 1979, and January 20, 1981. Imposes a surcharge, to be deposited into the Fund, of 30% on the amount of: (1) any fine or penalty imposed for a violation (committed on or after enactment of this Act) of a law or regulation penalizing any economic activity relating to Iran that is administered by the Departments of State, Treasury, Justice, Commerce, or Energy; or (2) the monetary amount of a settlement entered into by a person regarding a suspected violation of such a law or regulation. Requires distribution of Fund payments to members of the proposed class in the following amounts: to each living former hostage, $6,750 for each day of captivity; to the estate of each deceased former hostage, $6,750 for each day of captivity; to each spouse (who is also a member of the identified class) of a former hostage, $600,000, or to the estate of such spouse who is deceased, $600,000; and to each child (who is also a member of the identified class) of a former hostage, $600,000, or to the estate of such child who is deceased, $600,000. Specifies the order of payment distribution. Prohibits a payment recipient from maintaining an action against Iran in any federal or state court for any claims relating to the hostage events. Deems waived and forever released all existing claims against Iran for those events upon payment from the Fund to all designated recipients. Requires the Department of State to submit recommendations to Congress if Fund amounts will be insufficient to pay all recipients within 444 days after enactment of this Act.
Title
Justice for Former American Hostages in Iran Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB868 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government liability
Government trust funds
Income tax exclusion
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Sanctions
Transfer and inheritance taxes
Crime victims
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government liability
Government trust funds
Income tax exclusion
International affairs
Iran
Middle East
Sanctions
Transfer and inheritance taxes
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3338/BILLS-114hr3338ih.pdf |