US HB3323 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1933)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1933)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Major General David F. Wherley, Jr. District of Columbia National Guard Retention and College Access Act of 2009 - Authorizes the commanding general of the District of Columbia National Guard to provide educational assistance to members of the District of Columbia National Guard who have satisfactorily completed their initial active duty service and agree to serve for a period of not less than six years. Requires such assistance to be used by members for expenses incurred in pursuing their first undergraduate, master's, vocational, or technical degree or certification at an approved institution of higher education.
Title
Major General David F. Wherley, Jr. District of Columbia National Guard Retention and College Access Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-24 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1933) | |
2009-07-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2333 (Related) 2009-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
HB3913 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
HB3913 (Related) 2010-07-26 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Oversight of Government Management, the Federal Workforce, and the District of Columbia.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
District of Columbia
Education programs funding
Higher education
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Vocational education
District of Columbia
Education programs funding
Higher education
National Guard and reserves
Student aid and college costs
Vocational education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3323/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3323/BILLS-111hr3323ih.pdf |