US HB3317 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

SAFE Act of 2017 Stopping Abusive Female Exploitation Act of 2017

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE Act of 2017 Stopping Abusive Female Exploitation Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 409 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-12-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-12-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 656). (text: CR H9637)
2017-12-05HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9640)
2017-12-05HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2017-12-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3317.
2017-12-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9637-9639)
2017-12-05HouseMr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-11-02HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-11-02HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-08-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
2017-07-19HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2017-07-19HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback