US HB330 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on July 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-25 - Became Public Law No: 113-132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distinguished Flying Cross National Memorial Act - Designates a memorial located at March Field Air Museum in Riverside, California, as the Distinguished Flying Cross National Memorial, in honor of current and former members of the Armed Forces who have been awarded the Distinguished Flying Cross. Prohibits the designation of such memorial from being construed to require or permit the use of federal funds for any related purpose.
Title
Distinguished Flying Cross National Memorial Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] |
Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] | Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-25 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-132. |
2014-07-25 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-07-09 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4355-4364; text as passed Senate: CR S4355) |
2013-10-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 226. |
2013-10-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6853) |
2013-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 330. |
2013-10-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6853-6854) |
2013-10-29 | House | Mr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 26. |
2013-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-79. |
2013-04-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-04-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation Discharged. |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4435 (Related) 2014-06-05 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 425.
SB59 (Related) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104.
SB59 (Related) 2013-06-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 104.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
California
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition
California
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Public lands and natural resources
Veterans' organizations and recognition