US HB3285 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing Disparities Using Care Models and Education Act of 2015 This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to contract with the National Academy of Medicine (formerly known as the Institute of Medicine) to study health disparities, existing programs and policies intended to reduce disparities, and priorities for, and expansion of, programs targeting disparities. HHS must develop guidelines for entities to develop and implement programs to reduce health disparities. HHS must incorporate these guidelines into its activities. HHS may award grants for programs to reduce health disparities. The Innovation Center of the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must test a payment and service delivery model that includes incentives for reducing health disparities.
Title
Reducing Disparities Using Care Models and Education Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1903 (Related) 2015-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Minority health
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Minority health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3285/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3285/BILLS-114hr3285ih.pdf |