US HB3282 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Honest Fishermen Act of 2015 This bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to ensure that its seafood inspection activities are coordinated with the national sea grant college program to provide outreach on seafood safety to states, local health agencies, consumers, and the seafood industry. The Department of Commerce and the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) must ensure that seafood inspections and tests collect information for seafood fraud detection and prevention. "Seafood fraud" is defined as the mislabeling or misrepresentation of seafood information. Seafood imported into the United States or distributed or offered for sale in interstate commerce must display (on its packaging or otherwise accompanying the seafood) through processing, distribution, and final sale: (1) the market and scientific species names, (2) whether the seafood was harvested wild or was farm-raised, (3) the harvest method and date of the catch, and (4) the weight or number of product for an individual fish or lot. Additional information is required for seafood that was: (1) previously frozen, treated with substances affecting weight, or processed in a country other than that in which it was landed or harvested; or (2) farm-raised. The bill exempts importers, processors, distributors, or retailers from violations for unknowingly selling a product that was already mislabeled upon receipt, provided that such entities can produce the appropriate product traceability documentation. As an alternative to the disclosure requirements for certain categories of information, an importer, processor, distributor, or retailer (including a restaurant) may make the information available upon request to federal, state, or local officials authorized to conduct inspections of: (1) seafood, or (2) any facility that processes or sells seafood. Persons engaging in fishing on a U.S. vessel in the exclusive economic zone under the Magnuson-Stevens Fishery Conservation and Management Act are deemed to be in compliance with traceability requirements if they disclose data required for a fishery management plan. Seafood imports from an exporter shall be refused admission if any shipment of such seafood appears to be in violation of such seafood traceability requirements or other applicable federal laws or regulations. An exception is provided for individual shipments if the exporter presents evidence of compliance from an accredited laboratory. HHS and Commerce must post on their public websites a list that: (1) includes, by country, each exporter whose seafood is imported or offered for import into the United States; and (2) tracks, for each exporter, the timing, type, and frequency of violations. Commerce is required to: (1) increase the number of shipments inspected for seafood fraud by NOAA inspectors and authorized officers, (2) prevent the percentage of seafood shipments inspected from declining in a subsequent year, and (3) ensure that inspections for fraud prevention also collect seafood safety information. The bill also authorizes states to bring civil actions for seafood fraud violations.
Title
Protecting Honest Fishermen Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-08-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2015-08-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2015-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Consumer affairs
Food industry and services
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3282/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3282/BILLS-114hr3282ih.pdf |