US HB328 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of State to design, establish, and make publicly known a Vulnerability Disclosure Process to improve cybersecurity. In establishing the process, the State Department must identify which information technology should be included, determine whether the process should differentiate among and specify the types of security vulnerabilities that may be targeted, and provide a readily available form and means of reporting, amongst other requirements. The bill requires the State Department to establish a bug bounty pilot program, where an approved individual, organization, or company is temporarily authorized to identify and report vulnerabilities of internet-facing information technology of the State Department in exchange for compensation.
Title
Hack Your State Department Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 45 (Y: 377 N: 3 NV: 53 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-01-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 377 - 3 (Roll no. 45). (text: CR H979-980) |
2019-01-22 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H982-983) |
2019-01-22 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 328. |
2019-01-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H979-981) |
2019-01-22 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-22 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H981) |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1808 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3352 (Related) 2019-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB3352 (Related) 2019-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Science, technology, communications
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Science, technology, communications