US HB328 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Excess Federal Building and Property Disposal Act of 2013 - (Sec. 2) Directs the Administrator of the General Services Administration (GSA) to conduct the Federal Real Property Disposal Pilot Program (Program), under which the Administrator shall: (1) identify 15 federal government real properties that are excess or surplus and that have the highest fair market value and the greatest potential to sell, and (2) sell such properties by public auction within 5 years after the enactment of this Act. Requires the Administrator to designate an additional property for sale under the Program not later than 15 days after the sale of any excess property. Exempts from the Program: (1) real property that is to be closed or realigned under the Defense Base Closure and Realignment Act of 1990; (2) properties excluded for reasons of national security by OMB; (3) certain Indian and Native Eskimo properties; (4) properties operated and maintained by the Tennessee Valley Authority (TVA); (5) postal properties; (6) properties used in connection with river, harbor, flood control, reclamation, or power projects; (7) properties determined to be suitable for use as a public park or recreation area; and (8) properties used for recreational and conservation purposes. Directs the Comptroller General (GAO) to submit to Congress and make public a study on the effectiveness of the Program. Terminates the Program five years after the enactment of this Act. Requires the head of each executive agency to recommend properties to the Director of OMB for disposal under the Program. Sets forth requirements for the expedited disposal of excess real property under the Program, including that such property must be sold for cash, may not be sold for less than fair market value, and must generate monetary proceeds to the federal government. Requires the proceeds from the sale of excess properties under the Program to be deposited into the Treasury and 2% of such proceeds to be used for funding homeless assistance grants. Directs the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to make grants to nonprofit organizations to acquire or rehabilitate real property to provide permanent housing, transitional housing, or temporary shelter for persons who are homeless. Grants preference in awarding grants to private nonprofit organizations that operate within areas in which federal real property is being sold under the Program. (Sec. 3) Directs the Administrator to: (1) issue guidance for the development and implementation of executive agency real property plans, and (2) assist executive agencies in the identification and disposal of excess real property. Sets forth the duties of executive agencies with respect to the identification, maintenance, and disposal of excess real property. Directs the Administrator to report to specified congressional committees on the efforts of each executive agency to reduce real property assets. (Sec. 4) Authorizes the Administrator to obligate funds to pay the costs of identifying and preparing properties to be reported excess by another agency. (Sec. 5) Allows GSA to be reimbursed for the costs associated with the reversion, custody, and disposal of reverted real property. Requires the Administrator to: (1) take control of reverted property if necessary to enforce compliance with the terms of the conveyance and sell such property, and (2) make such property available to state and local governments and non-profit organizations for public benefit conveyance prior to sale. (Sec. 6) Allows the net proceeds of a sale of excess federal real property to be: (1) returned to the agency that had custody and accountability for such property, and (2) used for continuing disposal of excess properties and for deficit reduction. (Sec. 7) Requires the Administrator to publish a comprehensive database of all federal real property under the custody and control of all executive agencies, other than property excluded for reasons of national security, which shall be made available to other federal agencies and the general public at no cost through the GSA website. (Sec. 8) Requires federal agencies to recycle at least 50% of construction and demolition materials and debris by the end of FY2015. (Sec. 9) Amends the McKinney-Vento Homeless Assistance Act to: (1) exempt from the homeless review process federal properties that are located in an area for which the general public is denied access in the interest of national security, (2) allow properties available for use by the homeless to be published on the websites of HUD or GSA instead of in the Federal Register, and (3) exclude certain federal properties from subsequent publications of properties available for use by the homeless for which no review of a determination of suitability was requested.
Title
Excess Federal Building and Property Disposal Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 562. |
2015-01-02 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2015-01-02 | House | Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure for a period ending not later than Jan. 2, 2015 for consideration of such provisions of the bill as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1(r) of rule X. |
2015-01-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-731, Part I. |
2013-03-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Building construction
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Land transfers
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Building construction
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Housing and community development funding
Land transfers
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations