US HB3278 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for cooperative governing of individual health insurance coverage. This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to provide that the laws of a state designated by a health insurer (primary state) apply to individual health insurance coverage offered by that insurer in any state (secondary state) if the coverage, states, and insurer comply with the conditions of this bill. Insurers are exempted from any secondary state's laws that would prohibit or regulate the operation of the insurer in that state. The primary state is given sole jurisdiction to enforce its covered laws in any secondary state. The Government Accountability Office must study the effect of this bill on specified health insurance issues.
Title
To amend the Public Health Service Act to provide for cooperative governing of individual health insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB277 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB314 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1072 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB222 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1516 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2021 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB314 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB1072 (Related) 2017-02-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB222 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1516 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2021 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
Comprehensive health care
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3278/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3278/BILLS-115hr3278ih.pdf |