US HB3276 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Path to Full Obamacare Repeal Act This bill repeals the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, effective at the beginning of FY2019. Provisions of law amended by those Acts are restored.
Title
Responsible Path to Full Obamacare Repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Thomas Garrett [R-VA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and the Workforce, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB175 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB1718 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB106 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB277 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
HB1718 (Related) 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB106 (Related) 2017-01-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB277 (Related) 2017-02-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3276/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3276/BILLS-115hr3276ih.pdf |