US HB3275 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Water and Energy Sustainability through Technology Act This bill addresses the link between energy and water systems (energy-water nexus), including: (1) the water needed to produce energy; (2) the energy needed to transport, reclaim, treat, store, and reuse water and wastewater; (3) the energy available in organic wastewaters and wet waste streams (e.g., methane); and (4) the waste heat available in industrial process and cooling water discharges, steam system condensate and cooling water, and thermoelectric cooling water discharge. The bill provides support for increasing: the availability of energy-water nexus data about surface water, groundwater, or recycled water; the use of energy-water nexus technology; the energy efficiency of certain water systems; the use of water efficiency methods and products; water quality; the recharge of groundwater; the ability of water systems to address climate-related impacts on water quality or quantity; and the infrastructure of water and wastewater systems. In addition, the bill establishes a United States-Israel Water Cooperation Working Group to seek to strengthen dialogue between the United States and Israel in order to: (1) improve the use of water resources through water-saving technologies and practices; (2) counter water shortages; (3) modernize pipeline and other applicable infrastructure; and (4) pursue best practices in drip irrigation, water recycling, and desalination. The bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to eliminate certain tax incentives related to the extraction of oil, gas, or certain minerals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water and Energy Sustainability through Technology Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
2017-08-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2017-08-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
2017-07-18HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, Science, Space, and Technology, Ways and Means, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1696 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Charitable contributions
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of the Treasury
Ecology
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental technology
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Horticulture and plants
Hydrology and hydrography
Income tax deductions
Income tax exclusion
Industrial facilities
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Lighting and heating
Manufacturing
Middle East
Motor fuels
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Product safety and quality
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Securities
Small business
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Technology transfer and commercialization
Water quality
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback