US HB3271 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on July 17 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Access to Diabetes Supplies Act of 2017 This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to modify provisions relating to Medicare's competitive acquisition program (through which rates are set through a competitive bidding program rather than by an established fee schedule) with respect to diabetic testing strips. Specifically, the bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to: use specified data to determine whether a bid satisfies certain requirements related to volume of coverage with respect to such products, reject a bid if the bidder does not demonstrate its ability to furnish such products in a manner consistent with its bid, and establish a process to monitor the extent to which an entity continues to cover the product types included in its bid. The CMS may terminate a contract if it determines that an entity, for reasons other than product discontinuation or market-wide shortage, fails to maintain ready access to such products included its bid. In addition, the bill specifies that an entity furnishing such products to beneficiaries under the program: (1) must furnish to each beneficiary a brand of strips that is compatible with the beneficiary's home blood glucose monitor, (2) may not attempt to influence or incentivize a beneficiary to switch the brand of either type of product, and (3) must contact and receive a request from a beneficiary no more than 14 days prior to dispensing a refill to the beneficiary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Access to Diabetes Supplies Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 329.
2017-12-06HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2017-12-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-447, Part I.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-13HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2017-09-13HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1914 (Related) 2017-10-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback