US HB3262 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-129. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-29 - Became Public Law No: 114-129. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the conveyance of land of the Illiana Health Care System of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Danville, Illinois. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to convey to the Danville Area Community College of Danville, Illinois, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to certain real property, including improvements, known as Building Number 48, which is part of the VA Illiana Health Care System. As consideration for such conveyance the College shall convey to the United States all right, title, and interest in and to certain real property, including improvements, near the College Library Building.
Title
To provide for the conveyance of land of the Illiana Health Care System of the Department of Veterans Affairs in Danville, Illinois.
Sponsors
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-129. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S914) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2016-02-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H633) |
2016-02-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3262. |
2016-02-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H633-634) |
2016-02-09 | House | Mr. Abraham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-12-08 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-08-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-07-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1967 (Related) 2015-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Educational facilities and institutions
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Illinois
Land transfers
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Educational facilities and institutions
Health facilities and institutions
Higher education
Illinois
Land transfers
Veterans' medical care