US HB3245 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 14 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 330.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medicare Civil and Criminal Penalties Update Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicare Civil and Criminal Penalties Update Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 330.
2017-12-06HouseCommittee on Ways and Means discharged.
2017-12-06HouseReported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-448, Part I.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-13HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2017-09-13HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-07-19HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5925)
2017-07-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-07-14HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback