US HB3205 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Advisory Committee on Education Reauthorization Act of 2017 This bill extends the authority for the Veteran's Advisory Committee on Education until December 31, 2022.
Title
Veterans' Advisory Committee on Education Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-07-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2549 (Related) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
SB1555 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB3218 (Related) 2017-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 115-48. (TXT | PDF)
SB1555 (Related) 2017-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3205/BILLS-115hr3205ih.pdf |