US HB32 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H594)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H594)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Treasury to accept gifts of money for designing, constructing, or maintaining a barrier on the U.S. and Mexico border. Treasury shall establish a trust fund and website for that purpose.
Title
Buy a Brick, Build the Wall Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-15 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H594) |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
HB256 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB256 (Related) 2019-01-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Building construction
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration
Mexico
Building construction
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Immigration
Mexico
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/32/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr32/BILLS-116hr32ih.pdf |