US HB3186 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 680.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 680.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Every Kid Outdoors Act This bill directs the Departments of the Interior, Agriculture, Commerce, and the Army to establish the Every Kids Outdoors program to provide fourth graders free access to federal lands and waters to which the public has access. Such Departments shall issue such students annual passes, upon request, which shall allow free access to: a per-vehicle fee area for the student and any passengers accompanying the student in a private, noncommercial vehicle or for up to three adults accompanying the student on bicycles; or a per-person fee area for the student and up to three adults accompanying the student. In carrying out such program, such departments: may collaborate with state park systems that opt to implement a complementary Every Kid Outdoors State park pass, shall maintain a publicly available website that provides information about the program, may provide visitor services, and may support approved partners of the federal lands and waters by furnishing them with opportunities for participation in the program.
Title
Every Kid Outdoors Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-12 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 395 (Y: 383 N: 2 NV: 43 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 680. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-394. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-09-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 383 - 2 (Roll no. 395). (text: CR H8139) |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8158) |
2018-09-12 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-09-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3186. |
2018-09-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8139-8140) |
2018-09-12 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-08-03 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 678. |
2018-08-03 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-08-03 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2018-08-03 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-880, Part I. |
2018-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2018-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-08-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1522 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Child health
Elementary and secondary education
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Elementary and secondary education
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
User charges and fees