US HB3183 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-12)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the federal crop insurance program to authorize agricultural producers who harvest second crops as a result of a prevented planting to be eligible for specific crop insurance if certain conditions are met. Specifically, a producer may collect an indemnity that is equal to 100% of the prevented planting guarantee for the acreage of the first crop if (1) the acres planted are in an area with low hay or forage supplies due to widespread excessive moisture, flood, or drought; (2) the second crop will be planted with an intended use of animal feed that is hayed, gazed, or chopped; and (3) the second crop will be donated or used by the producer.
Title
FEEDD Act Feed Emergency Enhancement During Disasters Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2019-06-19 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4775-4776) |
2019-06-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2019-06-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8489 (Related) 2020-12-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3183/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3183/BILLS-116hr3183ih.pdf |