US HB3176 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 310.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster Assistance Fairness and Accountability Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill prohibits the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) from taking any action to recoup major disaster assistance from a recipient that received such assistance more than three years before FEMA first provided such recipient written notification of an intent to recoup it unless there is evidence of fraud.
Title
Disaster Assistance Fairness and Accountability Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. John Delaney [D-MD] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 310. |
2017-11-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-418. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-07-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1641 (Related) 2017-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.
HB4667 (Related) 2018-01-04 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 291.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB302 (Related) 2018-10-05 - Became Public Law No: 115-254.