US HB3171 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide that certain orthotist's and prosthetist's clinical notes under Medicare be treated as part of the patient's medical record. This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to specify that documentation created by an orthotist or prosthetist shall be considered part of a Medicare beneficiary's medical record for purposes of determining the reasonableness and medical necessity of orthotics and prosthetics.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide that certain orthotist's and prosthetist's clinical notes under Medicare be treated as part of the patient's medical record.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3178 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3171/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3171/BILLS-115hr3171ih.pdf |