US HB3166 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide under the Medicare program for independent accreditation for dialysis facilities and assurance of high quality surveys with respect to such facilities. This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to allow renal dialysis facilities to be accredited by an approved accreditation body for participation in the Medicare program. The bill also establishes a time frame with respect to initial surveys of renal dialysis facilities.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to provide under the Medicare program for independent accreditation for dialysis facilities and assurance of high quality surveys with respect to such facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3178 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1729 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1729 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Licensing and registrations
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3166/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3166/BILLS-115hr3166ih.pdf |