US HB3163 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Part B Home Infusion Services Temporary Transitional Payment Act This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to temporarily provide for transitional Medicare payment with respect to certain home infusion services furnished on or after January 1, 2019. Under current law, the Center for Medicare & Medicaid Services is required to establish a permanent payment system with respect to such services furnished on or after January 1, 2021.
Title
Medicare Part B Home Infusion Services Temporary Transitional Payment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] |
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-07-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3178 (Related) 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1738 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1738 (Related) 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3163/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3163/BILLS-115hr3163ih.pdf |