US HB3159 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 31 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-12-31 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Foreign Aid Transparency and Accountability Act of 2012 - Directs the President to establish guidelines regarding the establishment of measurable goals, performance metrics, and monitoring and evaluation plans for U.S. foreign assistance. Requires such guidelines to provide direction to federal departments and agencies that administer U.S. foreign assistance relating to: (1) resource monitoring, (2) project and program evaluation, and (3) analysis of findings and generalizations and their applicability to proposed project and program design. Requires: (1) each appropriate federal department or agency to begin using such guidelines within one year after their establishment, and (2) the President to submit a related report to Congress within 18 months. Directs the President to require the Secretary of State to establish and maintain an Internet website to make publicly available comprehensive and accessible information on U.S. foreign assistance programs on a country-by-country and program-by program basis. Authorizes a department or agency to use up to 5% of its foreign development assistance funds for activities under this Act.
Title
Foreign Aid Transparency and Accountability Act of 2012
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 390 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 390 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 390 N: 0 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2012-12-30 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-12-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 649). (text: CR H7458-7459) |
2012-12-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7464-7465) |
2012-12-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Connolly (VA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2012-12-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3159. |
2012-12-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7458-7461) |
2012-12-30 | House | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-10-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3310 (Same As) 2012-11-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 538.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Executive Office of the President
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement
Executive Office of the President
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
International affairs
Multilateral development programs
Performance measurement