US HB3154 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
E-Warranty Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) Amends the Magnuson-Moss Warranty--Federal Trade Commission Improvement Act to require the Federal Trade Commission to revise its rules to allow manufacturers to satisfy requirements concerning the availability of written warranties on consumer products by making the terms accessible in a digital format on the manufacturer's Internet website. Requires the product, packaging, or product manual in the case of a warranty provided on a website in such manner to display to the consumer: (1) the website where the warranty terms can be obtained; and (2) a phone number, postal address, or other reasonable non-Internet based means of contacting the manufacturer to obtain and review such terms. Prohibits such Internet website warranties from satisfying any requirement that a warranty be made available prior to sale in a retail location, by catalog, or through door-to-door sales, unless the seller makes the warranty available, through electronic or other means, at the location of the sale before the purchase.
Title
E-Warranty Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 184. |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-243. |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2015-07-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-07-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1359 (Related) 2015-09-24 - Became Public Law No: 114-51. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Commerce
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Internet and video services
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades
Commerce
Federal Trade Commission (FTC)
Internet and video services
Product safety and quality
Retail and wholesale trades