US HB3144 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for operations of the Federal Columbia River Power System pursuant to a certain operation plan for a specified period of time, and for other purposes. (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Bureau of Reclamation, the Bonneville Power Administration, and the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to operate the Federal Columbia River Power System (FCRPS) in a manner consistent with the document titled "Endangered Species Act Section 7(a)(2) Supplemental Biological Opinion," dated January 17, 2014, until the later of September 30, 2022, or the date upon which a subsequent final biological opinion for FCRPS operations is in effect with no pending further judicial review. (Sec. 3) Such entities may amend the supplemental opinion and operate the FCRPS accordingly before such date if the entities agree that: (1) the amendments are necessary for public safety or transmission and grid reliability; or (2) the actions, operations, or other requirements that the amendments remove are no longer warranted. (Sec. 4) No structural modification, action, study, or engineering plan may restrict electrical generation at any FCRPS hydroelectric dam or limit navigation on the Snake River in Washington, Oregon, or Idaho unless authorized by Congress.
Title
To provide for operations of the Federal Columbia River Power System pursuant to a certain operation plan for a specified period of time, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 152 (Y: 190 N: 226 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-25 - House - On passage RC# 153 (Y: 225 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - On passage RC# 153 (Y: 225 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-04-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-25 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 225 - 189 (Roll no. 153). (text: CR H3542-3543) |
2018-04-25 | House | On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 226 (Roll no. 152). |
2018-04-25 | House | The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. |
2018-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Jayapal motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment stating that nothing in this Act shall prohibit the sale of electric power generated by the Federal Columbia River Power System at the lowest possible rate consistent with sound business practices and other factors required by current law. |
2018-04-25 | House | Ms. Jayapal moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H3558) |
2018-04-25 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 3144. |
2018-04-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3144. |
2018-04-25 | House | The rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4, under a structured rule, and H.R. 3144, under a closed rule. The rule makes in order only those amendments printed in Part A of the committee report for H.R. 4. The rule provides for 1 hour of general debate for both H.R. 4 and H.R. 3144. The rule provides for one motion to recommit for both bills. And, the rule provides that on any legislative day during the period from April 30, 2018 through May 4, 2018, the Journal of the proceedings of the previous day shall be considered as approved. |
2018-04-25 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 839. (consideration: CR H3542-3560) |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 492. |
2018-04-18 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2018-04-18 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-643, Part I. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 17. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-10-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR839 (Related) 2018-04-25 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Idaho
Lakes and rivers
Oregon
Washington State
Water resources development
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Idaho
Lakes and rivers
Oregon
Washington State
Water resources development