US HB3133 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 804.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEA Act of 2017 Streamlining Environmental Approvals Act of 2017
Title
SEA Act of 2017 Streamlining Environmental Approvals Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] |
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 804. |
2018-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1030. |
2018-01-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-01-10 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-07-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4239 (Related) 2018-11-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 781.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Endangered and threatened species
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Trade restrictions
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection