US HB3117 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-999, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-02 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-999, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transparency and Honesty in Energy Regulations Act of 2017 This bill prohibits the Department of Energy, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), the Department of the Interior, and the Council on Environmental Quality from considering the social cost of carbon, methane, or nitrous oxide as part of any cost benefit analysis in the rule making process, unless a federal law is enacted authorizing such consideration. They may also consider those social costs if they use an estimate that: (1) complies with the requirements of the Office of Management and Budget's "Circular A-4" document; (2) uses the discount rates of three and seven percent specified in that document; (3) considers only the domestic costs and benefits of the activity; and (4) uses only the most up to date and empirically estimated equilibrium climate sensitivity distributions, and realistic time horizons. The EPA must report on the number of proposed and final rulemakings, guidance documents, and agency actions since January 2009 that use those social costs, including as part of any cost benefit analysis required under Executive Order 12866 or other relevant authority.
Title
Transparency and Honesty in Energy Regulations Act of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-999, Part I. |
2017-11-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 15. |
2017-11-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-29 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2017-07-27 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1512 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
Air quality
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3117/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3117/BILLS-115hr3117ih.pdf |