US HB311 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 69-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act or the FUELS Act - Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), in implementing the Spill Prevention, Control, and Countermeasure rule with respect to any farm, to require certification of compliance with such rule by: (1) a professional engineer for a farm with an individual tank with an aboveground storage capacity greater than 10,000 gallons, an aggregate aboveground storage capacity of at least 42,000 gallons, or a history that includes a spill, as determined by the Administrator; or (2) the owner or operator of the farm (via self-certification) for a farm with an aggregate aboveground storage capacity greater than 10,000 gallons but less than 42,000 gallons and no history of spills. Directs the Administrator to exempt from all requirements of such rule any farm with an aggregate aboveground storage capacity of 10,000 gallons or less and no history of spills. Excludes from the aggregate storage capacity of a farm all containers on separate parcels that have a capacity that is less than 1,320 gallons.
Title
Farmers Undertake Environmental Land Stewardship Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2014-03-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2264-2265) |
2014-03-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 311. |
2014-03-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2264-2266) |
2014-03-11 | House | Mr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. (consideration: CR H2264) |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 279. |
2014-03-06 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-375. |
2013-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2013-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged. |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2013-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
SB496 (Related) 2013-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
Water quality
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Oil and gas
Water quality