US HB3070 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
EEZ Transit Zone Clarification and Access Act (Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to permit and regulate Atlantic striped bass recreational fishing in the Block Island Sound Transit Zone. The transit zone is the area of federal waters within Block Island Sound, located between areas south of Montauk Point, New York, and Point Judith, Rhode Island.
Title
EEZ Transit Zone Clarification and Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2016-06-07 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3486) |
2016-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3070. |
2016-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3486-3487) |
2016-06-07 | House | Mr. Hardy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-04-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397. |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-517. |
2016-03-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-08-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-07-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-07-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Atlantic Ocean
Congressional oversight
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Intergovernmental relations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
State and local government operations