US HB3062 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to consider the aircraft registry office in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, as excepted during a Government shutdown or emergency (as it provides excepted services) to ensure that it remains open during any Government shutdown or emergency. This bill directs the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to consider the FAA Aircraft Registry Office in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, as excepted during a government shutdown or emergency to ensure that it remains open during such an event.
Title
To require the Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration to consider the aircraft registry office in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma, as excepted during a Government shutdown or emergency (as it provides excepted services) to ensure that it remains open during any Government shutdown or emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2017-06-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2017-06-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1432 (Related) 2017-06-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
HB2997 (Related) 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
HB4 (Related) 2018-05-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Licensing and registrations
Oklahoma
Transportation and public works
Aviation and airports
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Licensing and registrations
Oklahoma
Transportation and public works
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3062/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3062/BILLS-115hr3062ih.pdf |